Global Patent Index - EP 0984524 A2

EP 0984524 A2 2000-03-08 - Two-part electrical connector

Title (en)

Two-part electrical connector

Title (de)

Zweiteiliger elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique en deux parties

Publication

EP 0984524 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116289 A

Priority

DE 19837896 A

Abstract (en)

Two plug-in connectors (12,14) are linked together by an adjustable coupler (16) attached to a limited-range moving control component (52) that can be forced by a spring (56) into a non-operating position in relation to the coupler or pushed against the spring into an operating position. This control element can be locked in its operating position by a releasable locking device.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Steckverbinder 10 umfaßt zwei zusammensteckbare Verbinderteilen 12, 14, die mittels eines Koppelteils 16 miteinander koppelbar sind, das hierzu in eine Koppelstellung bewegbar ist. Dem Koppelteil 16 ist ein über einen definierten Bereich relativ zu diesem bewegbares Kontrollelement 52 zugeordnet, das durch Federkraft 56 in eine bezüglich des Koppelteils 16 ausgerückte Position belastet und entgegen der Federkraft 56 in eine bezüglich des Koppelteils 16 eingerückte Position verschiebbar ist. Das Kontrollelement 52 ist durch insbesondere lösbare Rastmittel 58, 60 bei seine Koppelstellung einnehmendem und in dieser verrastetem Koppelteil 16 in seiner eingerückten Position fixierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62927 (2013.01); H01R 13/635 (2013.01); H01R 13/62911 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837896 A1 20000224; EP 0984524 A2 20000308; EP 0984524 A3 20000524; EP 0984524 B1 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905723

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100818

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-09-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905723 P 20030703

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-11-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO-PART ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH A COUPLE MEMBER AND A MOVABLE INDICATOR MEMBER

2002-09-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO-PART ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH A COUPLE MEMBER AND A MOVABLE INDICATOR MEMBER

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/627 A, 7H 01R 13/629 B, 7H 01R 13/436 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI