Global Patent Index - EP 0984525 A1

EP 0984525 A1 2000-03-08 - Elastic female contact for miniature connector

Title (en)

Elastic female contact for miniature connector

Title (de)

Elastischer Buchsenkontakt für Miniatursteckverbinder

Title (fr)

Contact douille élastique pour connecteur ultraminiature

Publication

EP 0984525 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402121 A

Priority

FR 9810879 A

Abstract (en)

The elastic contact socket (1) receives a male connector (2) in the form of a pin, and is coaxially surrounded by a centering tube (3) in the shape of the pin. The ends of the tube for receiving the pin includes an annular groove (4) presenting a curved interior surface (5), this groove extending towards the end of the tube by an annular border (7) having a curved surface (8) projecting towards the exterior.

Abstract (fr)

Le contact douille élastique (1) pour connecteur ultraminiature, est destiné à recevoir axialement un contact mâle (2) en forme de broche, cette douille (1) étant entourée coaxialement par un tube de recentrage (3) du contact (2) en forme de broche. L'extrémité du tube (3) destinée à recevoir le contact en forme de broche (2) comprend une gorge annulaire (4) et faisant saillie à l'intérieur du tube (3) présentant une surface courbe (5), cette gorge (4) étant prolongée vers l'extrémité du tube (3) par une bordure annulaire (7) présentant une surface courbe (8) faisant saillie vers l'extérieur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/631 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/631 (2013.01); H01R 13/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984525 A1 20000308; EP 0984525 B1 20020417; DE 69901277 D1 20020523; DE 69901277 T2 20021002; FR 2782850 A1 20000303; FR 2782850 B1 20001110

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INTERNATIONAL

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901277 20020523

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT SE

2002-04-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB IT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB IT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI