Global Patent Index - EP 0984526 A2

EP 0984526 A2 2000-03-08 - Electrical connection box with overvoltage protection

Title (en)

Electrical connection box with overvoltage protection

Title (de)

Überspannungsschutzsteckdose

Title (fr)

Prise de courant protegée contre les surtensions

Publication

EP 0984526 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116532 A

Priority

DE 29815547 U

Abstract (en)

The plug socket has a socket housing (1) receiving a socket insert (2) of given depth, with the space between the socket insert and the wall of the socket housing used for accommodating the overvoltage protection components (6-8). The components are attached to the inside of a flexible band (9) which is fitted around the outside of the socket insert, so that the overvoltage components fit into corresponding recesses formed in the outside wall of the socket insert.

Abstract (de)

Eine solche Überspannungsschutzsteckdose ist mit einem in ein Leergehäuse (1), wie eine Leerdose, einsetzbaren Sockel (2) versehen, der eine vorgegebene Einbautiefe und Bauelemente (6-8) für die Überspannungsschutzeinrichtung (2) hat, die im Doseninnernraum zwischen dem eingesetzten Sockel (2) und der Wandung des Leergehäuses (1) angeordnet sind. Zur Schaffung einer solchen Überspannungsschutzsteckdose, die als Standardsteckdose ausgeführt ist und bei der eine einwandfreie Fixierung der Bauteile der Überspannungsschutzeinrichtung am Sockel besteht sind die Überspannungsschutz-Bauelemente (6-8) an der Innenseite eines biegsamen Gurtes (9) angeordnet und dieser Gurt (9) ist um den Umfang des Sockels (2) herumgelegt und daran befestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/68; H02H 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/68 (2006.01); H02H 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2013.01); H01R 13/68 (2013.01); H02H 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815547 U1 19981015; EP 0984526 A2 20000308; EP 0984526 A3 20000517; EP 0984526 B1 20011205; PL 193540 B1 20070228; PL 335153 A1 20000313

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140824

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140824

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900485 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000707

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000707

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/68 A, 7H 02H 9/04 B, 7H 01R 13/66 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI