Global Patent Index - EP 0984529 A2

EP 0984529 A2 2000-03-08 - Hook commutator for an electric machine

Title (en)

Hook commutator for an electric machine

Title (de)

Haken-kommutator für eine elektrische Maschine

Title (fr)

Commutateur à crochets pour une machine électrique

Publication

EP 0984529 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117118 A

Priority

DE 19839989 A

Abstract (en)

A hook-commutator includes segments or bars (2.1;3.1) distributed around the periphery of the commutator and wiped by the brushes (4,5). Commutator hooks (2;3) are moulded on to the segments or bars and have their edge-side to the brush wiping face (4.1;5.1), and one fixture plane (2.2;3.2) for the segments (bars) in the commutator with each commutator-hook (2;3) holding a winding (6;7). The commutator hooks (2;3) have their free ends, jutting out of the fixture plane (2.2;3.2) designed as the segments (bars) (2.1;3.1) wiped by the brushes (4;5) and brought into the plane of the brush wiping face (4,1;5.1).

Abstract (de)

Zur Minderung des axialen Einbauraums bei gleichzeitig einfacher Fertigung sind die Kommutator-Haken (2;3) mit ihren freien, zu ihrer Verankerungsebene (2.2;3.2) in dem Kommutator abgewandten Enden als beschleifbare Lamellen (2.1;3.1) ausgebildet und nach Aufnahme, insbesondere Umschlingung, von zumindest einem Wicklungsdraht (6;7) in die Ebene der Bürstenschleiffläche (4.1;5.1) gebracht; in vorteilhafter Weise ist dabei die gesamte axiale Länge des Kommutators als Bürstenschleiffläche ausnutzbar. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/04 (2006.01); H01R 39/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/04 (2013.01); H01R 39/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984529 A2 20000308; EP 0984529 A3 20010314; EP 0984529 B1 20020116; DE 19839989 A1 20000316; DE 19839989 C2 20001102; ES 2172278 T3 20020916

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900618

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELL, DE

- Effective date: 20120125

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050901

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-08-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172278 T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900618 20020221

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREXLMAIER, THOMAS

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTEL, GERD DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEIM, NORBERT, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REDELBERGER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEILER, THEO

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKUTSCHIK, VIKTOR

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MICHAEL

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREXLMAIER, THOMAS

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTEL, GERD DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEIM, NORBERT, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REDELBERGER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEILER, THEO

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKUTSCHIK, VIKTOR

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MICHAEL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 39/04 A, 7H 01R 39/32 B, 7H 02K 13/00 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI