Global Patent Index - EP 0984529 A3

EP 0984529 A3 2001-03-14 - Hook commutator for an electric machine

Title (en)

Hook commutator for an electric machine

Title (de)

Haken-kommutator für eine elektrische Maschine

Title (fr)

Commutateur à crochets pour une machine électrique

Publication

EP 0984529 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99117118 A

Priority

DE 19839989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0984529A2] A hook-commutator includes segments or bars (2.1;3.1) distributed around the periphery of the commutator and wiped by the brushes (4,5). Commutator hooks (2;3) are moulded on to the segments or bars and have their edge-side to the brush wiping face (4.1;5.1), and one fixture plane (2.2;3.2) for the segments (bars) in the commutator with each commutator-hook (2;3) holding a winding (6;7). The commutator hooks (2;3) have their free ends, jutting out of the fixture plane (2.2;3.2) designed as the segments (bars) (2.1;3.1) wiped by the brushes (4;5) and brought into the plane of the brush wiping face (4,1;5.1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 39/04; H01R 39/32; H02K 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/04 (2006.01); H01R 39/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 39/04 (2013.01); H01R 39/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984529 A2 20000308; EP 0984529 A3 20010314; EP 0984529 B1 20020116; DE 19839989 A1 20000316; DE 19839989 C2 20001102; ES 2172278 T3 20020916

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900618

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELL, DE

- Effective date: 20120125

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100831

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050901

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2004-08-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172278 T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900618 20020221

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREXLMAIER, THOMAS

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTEL, GERD DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEIM, NORBERT, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REDELBERGER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEILER, THEO

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKUTSCHIK, VIKTOR

2001-08-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MICHAEL

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DREXLMAIER, THOMAS

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTEL, GERD DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEIM, NORBERT, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOENIG, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REDELBERGER, HARALD, DIPL.-ING.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEILER, THEO

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKUTSCHIK, VIKTOR

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAGNER, MICHAEL

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 39/04 A, 7H 01R 39/32 B, 7H 02K 13/00 B

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI