Global Patent Index - EP 0984659 A2

EP 0984659 A2 2000-03-08 - Acoustic panel

Title (en)

Acoustic panel

Title (de)

Schallwand

Title (fr)

Panneau acoustique

Publication

EP 0984659 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114407 A

Priority

DE 19840375 A

Abstract (en)

The sound wall has a flat or slightly curved reproduction plane (30) and is made up of at least two segments (11). At least one segment is a sound radiation segment with which sound waves can be radiated at the reproduction plane. The segments are coupled together at their edges by connecting elements.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befaßt sich mit der Ausbildung von Schallwänden für Großveranstaltungen. Herkömmlich werden dabei zur Schallwiedergabe eine Vielzahl von großen und schweren Lautsprecherboxen eingesetzt, was aufwendige und teure Konstruktionen zur Aufnahme dieser Boxen erfordert. Daher wird erfindungsgemäß eine segmentierte Schallwand 10 angegeben, welche im wesentlichen flach ausgebildet und außerordentlich leicht ist. Werden mehrere dieser Segmente 11' in einer Schallwand 10 integriert, indem die verschiedenen Segmente 11' gekoppelt miteinander verbunden werden, kann die gesamte Größe der Schallwand 10 zur Schallabstrahlung ausgenutzt werden, ohne daß weitere Schallquellen im Abhörraum 31 notwendig werden. Die Optimierung der verschiedenen Segmente 11' aufbestimmte Frequenzbereiche kann dadurch herbeigeführt werden, daß die jeweiligen Segmente 11' auf die entsprechenden Übertragungsfrequenzen abgestimmte Flächen- und Tiefenausdehnungen haben. Durch die Aneinanderreihung mehrerer Schallwände 10 die auf die jeweiligen Bedingungen im Abhörraum 31 sehr flexibel reagiert werden. Außerdem können die dem Abhörraum zugewandten Wiedergabeebenen 30 dieser Schallwände 10 beispielsweise durch entsprechende Aufdrucke als Werbeträger genutzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/06 (2006.01); H04R 1/24 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/12 (2006.01); H04R 1/26 (2006.01); H04R 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/06 (2013.01); H04R 1/24 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 7/10 (2013.01); H04R 2201/021 (2013.01); H04R 2440/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0984659 A2 20000308; EP 0984659 A3 20060906; EP 0984659 B1 20080227; DE 19840375 A1 20000309; DE 19840375 C2 20030828; DE 59914664 D1 20080410; US 6170603 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2008-10-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914664 P 20080410

2008-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-02-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070303

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070402

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2006-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 7/06 20060101AFI20060801BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 7/04 20060101ALI20060801BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 7/12 20060101ALI20060801BHEP

2006-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/26 20060101ALN20060801BHEP

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI