Global patent index - EP 0984665 A2

EP 0984665 A2 2000-03-08 - Transducer arrangement for partially or completely implanted hearing-aid

Title (en)

Transducer arrangement for partially or completely implanted hearing-aid

Title (de)

Wandler für teil- oder vollimplantierbare Hörgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif transducteur pour prothèse auditive partiellement ou totalement implantée

Publication

EP 0984665 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98121613 A

Priority

DE 19840211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19840211C1] The transducer has a housing (14) that can be fixed at the implantation position and a mechanically stiff coupling element (20) movable with respect to the housing. A piezoelectric element (22) mounted in the housing can set the coupling element vibrating, and the vibrations are transferred to a middle ear ossicle or directly to the inner ear, after implantation of the transducer. An electromagnet arrangement (30,32) in the housing has a fixed and a vibrating component connected to the coupling element, so that the vibrations of the vibrating component are transferred to the coupling element. An Independent claim is also included for a partially or fully implantable hearing aid.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wandler für teil- oder vollimplantierbare Hörgeräte zur direkten mechanischen Anregung des Mittel- oder Innenohres. Der Wandler ist versehen mit einem am Implantationsort fixierbaren Gehäuse (14) und einem mit Bezug auf das Gehäuse beweglichen, mechanisch steifen Koppelelement (20), wobei in dem Gehäuse ein piezoelektrisches Element (22, 222) untergebracht ist, mit dem sich das Koppelelement in Schwingungen versetzen läßt, die nach erfolgter Implantation des Wandlers auf ein Mittelohr-Ossikel oder direkt auf das Innenohr übertragen werden. In dem Gehäuse (14) ist ferner eine Elektromagnetanordnung (30, 32) vorgesehen, die ein mit Bezug auf das Gehäuse fixiertes Bauteil (32) sowie ein schwingfähiges Bauteil (30) aufweist, welches mit dem Koppelelement (20) derart in Verbindung steht, daß Schwingungen des schwingfähigen Bauteils auf das Koppelelement übertragen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 11/02 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 17/00 (2013.01); H04R 11/02 (2013.01); H04R 25/606 (2013.01); H04R 2225/67 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19840211 C1 19991230; AU 2391499 A 20000316; AU 760240 B2 20030508; CA 2270127 A1 20000303; CA 2270127 C 20011016; DE 59814262 D1 20080918; DK 0984665 T3 20081124; EP 0984665 A2 20000308; EP 0984665 A3 20060517; EP 0984665 B1 20080806; US 6123660 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59814262

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111112

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111112

2012-07-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2012-06-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090507

2008-11-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2008-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59814262

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2008-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2006-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHONAK AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPLEX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT HEARING TECHNOLOGY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI