Global Patent Index - EP 0984681 A1

EP 0984681 A1 2000-03-15 - PROCESS AND COMPOSITIONS PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL EFFECTIVENESS OF EXOGENOUS CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES IN PLANTS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND COMPOSITIONS PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL EFFECTIVENESS OF EXOGENOUS CHEMICAL SUBSTANCES IN PLANTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER BIOLOGISCHEN EFFEKTIVITÄT EXOGENER CHEMISCHE SUBSTANZEN IN PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET COMPOSITIONS AMELIORANT L'EFFICACITE BIOLOGIQUE DE SUBSTANCES CHIMIQUES EXOGENES SUR LES PLANTES

Publication

EP 0984681 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925033 A

Priority

  • FR 9706917 A
  • US 9811019 W
  • US 8297498 P
  • US 8300598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853680A1] A plant treatment composition for application of an anionic exogenous chemical substance such as glyphosate herbicide to foliage of a plant is provided. The composition is a colloidal suspension having supramolecular aggregates dispersed in an aqueous application medium. The supramolecular aggregates comprise one or more amphiphilic salt(s) having anions of the exogenous chemical substance and cations derived by protonation of one or more amine compound(s) each having formula (I), wherein R<1> and R<2> are independently linear hydrocarbyl chains each having 6 to about 22 carbon atoms, and R<3> is hydrogen, a C1-5 hydrocarbyl group or a linear hydrocarbyl chain no longer than R<1> and no longer than R<2>. The exogenous chemical substance is present in the composition in a first molar amount X<1> in the form of said amphiphilic salt(s) and in a zero or second molar amount X<2> in the form of one or more salt(s) having anions of the exogenous chemical substance and cations derived from one or more base(s) other than an amine compound of formula (I). X<1> as a fraction of (X<1> + X<2>) is about 0.01 to 1. Also provided are a liquid concentrate composition which, upon dilution with water, forms a plant treatment composition, and a process for making such a liquid concentrate composition. Plant treatment compositions of the invention are useful for eliciting a desired biological activity, for example herbicidal activity, in a plant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 25/04; A01N 25/30; A01N 57/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 25/04 (2006.01); A01N 25/30 (2006.01); A01N 57/20 (2006.01); C07F 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 9/3813 (2013.01); A01N 25/04 (2013.01); A01N 25/30 (2013.01); A01N 57/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 57/20 + A01N 25/30 + A01N 25/04
  2. A01N 57/20 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853680A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853680 A1 19981203; AU 733912 B2 20010531; AU 7707298 A 19981230; BR 9809193 A 20000801; CA 2292430 A1 19981203; EP 0984681 A1 20000315; NZ 501367 A 20010629

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOULA, GERARD, G.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEYRUEIX, REMI

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEMERCIER, ALAIN, J., L.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CAISSE, PHILIPPE, G.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WARD, ANTHONY, J., I.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GILLESPIE, JANE, L.

2000-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRINKER, RONALD, J.

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991203;LT PAYMENT 19991203;LV PAYMENT 19991203;MK PAYMENT 19991203;RO PAYMENT 19991203;SI PAYMENT 19991203