Global Patent Index - EP 0984692 A4

EP 0984692 A4 2001-02-21 - NOVEL ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (en)

NOVEL ANGIOGENESIS INHIBITORS

Title (de)

ANGIOGENESE-INHIBITOREN

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS D'ANGIOGENESE

Publication

EP 0984692 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98923719 A

Priority

  • GB 9800681 A
  • US 9810590 W
  • US 4807697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854093A1] The present invention relates to compounds which inhibit tyrosine kinase enzymes, compositions which contain tyrosine kinase inhibiting compounds and methods of using tyrosine kinase inhibitors to treat tyrosine kinase-dependent diseases/conditions such as angiogenesis, cancer, atherosclerosis, diabetic retinopathy or autoimmune diseases, in mammals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/54; A61K 31/305; C07D 487/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] EP 0795555 A1 19970917 - OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]
  • [XP] WO 9729109 A1 19970814 - JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al
  • [X] KIRKPATRICK W E ET AL: "3-HALO-5,7-DIMETHYLPYRAZOLO U1,5-APYRIMIDINES, A NONBENZODIAZEPINOID CLASS OF ANTIANXIETY AGENTS DEVOID OF POTENTIATION OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM DEPRESSANT EFFECTS OF ETHANOL OR BARBITURATES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, vol. 20, no. 3, 1 March 1977 (1977-03-01), pages 386 - 393, XP000670076, ISSN: 0022-2623
  • See also references of WO 9854093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854093 A1 19981203; AU 734009 B2 20010531; AU 7594498 A 19981230; CA 2291709 A1 19981203; EP 0984692 A1 20000315; EP 0984692 A4 20010221; JP 2002501532 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040224

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2001-02-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01N 43/54 A, 7C 07D 487/04 B, 7A 61K 31/305 B, 7C 07D 487/04 J, 7C 07D 239:00 J, 7C 07D 231:00 J

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE