Global Patent Index - EP 0984710 A1

EP 0984710 A1 2000-03-15 - SEPARATOR, ESPECIALLY FOR SEPARATING FILLING MATERIAL FOR PRODUCING BRUSHES, SUCH AS SIDE BRUSHES

Title (en)

SEPARATOR, ESPECIALLY FOR SEPARATING FILLING MATERIAL FOR PRODUCING BRUSHES, SUCH AS SIDE BRUSHES

Title (de)

ABTEILER, INSBESONDERE ZUR SEPARIERUNG VON BESATZMATERIAL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BÜRSTEN, WIE Z.B. STREIFENBÜRSTEN

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR SEPARER UNE MATIERE DE GARNISSAGE POUR LA FABRICATION DE BROSSES, NOTAMMENT DES BROSSES LATERALES

Publication

EP 0984710 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908762 A

Priority

  • DE 9900281 W
  • DE 19808883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944467A1] The invention relates to a separator, especially for separating filling material (2) for producing brushes, such as side brushes. The separator has at least one hopper (3) which accommodates the filling material, and the lateral delimitations (4, 5) of the hopper are arranged so that they can move. The separator is configured in such a way that the material to be separated is neither compacted nor subjected to long cycle times and unwanted heating in the separator. To this end, the lateral delimitations (4, 5) of the hopper (3) are provided so that they horizontally sweep and/or move in a to-and-fro manner over at least two stationary devices (6, 7) during delivery of the filling material (2), and the two devices (6, 7) are arranged at a distance from one another such that they construct a continuous separating slit (8) between them. During conveyance of the filling material (2), said material passes through the separating slit in order to be delivered to an additional processing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 3/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944467A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944467 A1 19990910; AT 225137 T 20021015; AU 2825699 A 19990920; DE 19808883 C1 19991007; EP 0984710 A1 20000315; EP 0984710 B1 20021002; US 6302492 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WOHLER BURSCH TECH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140228

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-05 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2006-03-24 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021002

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-01-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 225137 T 20021015

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020227

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991016

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL