Global patent index - EP 0984717 A1

EP 0984717 A1 2000-03-15 - NON-INVASIVE DIAGNOSTIC METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

NON-INVASIVE DIAGNOSTIC METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NICHT-INVASIVEN DIAGNOSTIK

Title (fr)

METHODE ET APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSTIC NON EFFRACTIF

Publication

EP 0984717 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922975 A

Priority

  • GB 9801524 W
  • GB 9710561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852460A1] Two light sources (2, 3; 20, 22) of wavelenghts within the region 1.1 to 1.6 mu m, modulated at the same frequency but in antiphase to each other, are transmitted through a tooth (6; 24). Transmitted light is measured by a detector (9; 26) provided with an electronic filter set (28) to pass only the modulated frequency signal corresponding to differences in absorption between the two wavelenghts. The differential absorption detection serves as a basis for caries detection. Scatter of the light in tissue is offset by the use of optical spatial filtering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61C 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/0088 (2013.01); A61B 2562/0238 (2013.01); A61C 19/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852460A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852460 A1 19981126; AU 7543398 A 19981211; EP 0984717 A1 20000315; GB 9710561 D0 19970716

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DENFOTEX TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL ZEISS MEDITEC AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCLEPION-MEDITEC LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT