Global Patent Index - EP 0984761 A1

EP 0984761 A1 2000-03-15 - USE OF A SOUND PULSE SOURCE

Title (en)

USE OF A SOUND PULSE SOURCE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER IMPULSSCHALLQUELLE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE SOURCE SONORE IMPULSIONNELLE

Publication

EP 0984761 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934762 A

Priority

  • DE 9801393 W
  • DE 19721218 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721218A1] The invention relates to the use of a sound pulse source known per se and which is provided with a therapy head to generate acoustic pulses to treat cellulitis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/225 (2006.01); A61H 23/00 (2006.01); A61N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/008 (2013.01); A61N 7/00 (2013.01); A61N 2007/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852512A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721218 A1 19981126; DE 19721218 B4 20061214; EP 0984761 A1 20000315; WO 9852512 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DORNIER MEDTECH HOLDING INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI