Global Patent Index - EP 0984784 B1

EP 0984784 B1 2002-11-20 - ANTI-CANCER PRODUCTS FOR TREATING CYSTIC FIBROSIS

Title (en)

ANTI-CANCER PRODUCTS FOR TREATING CYSTIC FIBROSIS

Title (de)

ANTITUMORALE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MUCOVISCIDOSIS

Title (fr)

PRODUITS ANTI-CANCEREUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MUCOVISCIDOSE

Publication

EP 0984784 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98928381 A

Priority

  • FR 9801074 W
  • FR 9706667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763845A1] The invention concerns a novel approach for treating cystic fibrosis using, in particular, anti-cancer chemotherapy. For the treatment of cystic fibrosis it proposes the use of at least one product which when administered to a patient brings about the expression or overexpression of an ABC carrier compound, in particular glutathione carrier. Preferably, the products used are anti-cancer products whose administration brings about the expression of MRP and/or MDR protein. The invention is also applicable to the treatment of rheumatoid polyarthritis or asthma.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/675; A61K 31/165; A61K 31/475; A61K 31/70; A61P 35/00; C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/131 (2006.01); A61K 31/15 (2006.01); A61K 31/165 (2006.01); A61K 31/175 (2006.01); A61K 31/255 (2006.01); A61K 31/282 (2006.01); A61K 31/36 (2006.01); A61K 31/439 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/66 (2006.01); A61K 31/664 (2006.01); A61K 31/675 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/704 (2006.01); A61K 31/7052 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); G01N 21/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/165 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/475 (2013.01); A61K 31/675 (2013.01); A61K 31/704 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/165 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/198 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 31/475 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 31/675 + A61K 2300/00
  5. A61K 31/704 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763845 A1 19981204; FR 2763845 B1 20030418; AT 227994 T 20021215; AU 8023298 A 19981230; CA 2291928 A1 19981203; CA 2291928 C 20120710; DE 69809546 D1 20030102; DE 69809546 T2 20031002; EP 0984784 A2 20000315; EP 0984784 B1 20021120; JP 2002502389 A 20020122; US 6635627 B1 20031021; WO 9853839 A2 19981203; WO 9853839 A3 19990910

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130528

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809546

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130528

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0984784E

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809546 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227994 T 20021215

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOVEN, VERONIQUE

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LENOIR, GERARD

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LALLEMAND, JEAN-YVES

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANNEREAU, JEAN-PHILIPPE

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARTHE, JOEL

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BLANQUET, SYLVAIN

2002-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/675 A, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 31/165 B, 7A 61K 31/475 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE