Global Patent Index - EP 0984821 A1

EP 0984821 A1 2000-03-15 - DEVICE FOR COUPLING A SHOE WITH A SPORTS GEAR

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR COUPLING A SHOE WITH A SPORTS GEAR

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES SCHUHS MIT EINEM SPORTARTIKEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON D'UNE CHAUSSURE A UN ARTICLE DE SPORT

Publication

EP 0984821 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99939832 A

Priority

  • FR 9900502 W
  • FR 9803646 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776200A1] The fastening consists of a fixing member anchored to the ski or skate, equipped with a toe stop (60) for the boot, and an elastic coupling (50) which engages with a sole clamp (17) and pulls the boot towards the stop. The elastic coupling is in the form of a U-shaped wire engaging with the sole clamp and connected to the fixing member to the rear of the toe stop by an anchor (40) which is adjustable lengthwise and can be articulated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/20 (2013.01); A63C 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947219A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776200 A1 19990924; FR 2776200 B1 20000505; AT 295209 T 20050515; DE 69925214 D1 20050616; DE 69925214 T2 20060119; EP 0984821 A1 20000315; EP 0984821 B1 20050511; NO 314787 B1 20030526; NO 995472 A 19991109; NO 995472 D0 19991109; US 2001050472 A1 20011213; US 6435537 B2 20020820; WO 9947219 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69925214

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69925214 P 20050616

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2005-05-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040115

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE