Global Patent Index - EP 0984822 A1

EP 0984822 A1 2000-03-15 - LENGTH-ADJUSTABLE TUBE, SPECIALLY FOR SKI POLES OR WALKING STICKS

Title (en)

LENGTH-ADJUSTABLE TUBE, SPECIALLY FOR SKI POLES OR WALKING STICKS

Title (de)

LÄNGENVERSTELLBARES ROHR, INSBESONDERE FÜR SKI- ODER WANDERSTÖCKE

Title (fr)

TUBE REGLABLE EN LONGUEUR, NOTAMMENT POUR BATONS DE SKI OU CANNES

Publication

EP 0984822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924222 A

Priority

  • DE 29708829 U
  • EP 9802478 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6250839B1] The present invention relates to a length-adjustable tube for ski poles or walking sticks, comprising on outer tube and a telescopically foldable inner tube which be inserted into the outer tube to adjust the length of the tube. Also included, is a expansion device with an expansion element which is held on the insert section of the inner tube and which can be pressed apart by exerting a quasi-radial pressure. The expansion device enables the inner tube to be axially and tightly clamped in the outer tube. In order to ensure that the expansion device engages inside the outer tube in all cases, it is provided that the expansion element pertaining to the expansion device if fitted on the area where it can be pressed apart by exerting a quasi-radial pressure with at least one soft-elastic friction element compensating diameter tolerance between the inner and outer tube and protruding above the outer periphery.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/221 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32426 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32467 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32501 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852657A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708829 U1 19980917; AT 270914 T 20040715; EP 0984822 A1 20000315; EP 0984822 B1 20040714; JP 2001527450 A 20011225; US 6250839 B1 20010626; WO 9852657 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080427

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070405

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-07-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-01-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811676 P 20040819

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI