Global Patent Index - EP 0984836 A1

EP 0984836 A1 2000-03-15 - CONTINUOUS CASTING DEVICE

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS CASTING DEVICE

Title (de)

STRANGGIESSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE

Publication

EP 0984836 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930741 A

Priority

  • EP 9803134 W
  • LU 90071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853935A1] The invention relates to a continuous casting device comprising a support structure (16, 116), a swing lever (24, 124) which is pivotally mounted in the support structure (16,166) around a first pivotal axis, a drive mechanism (34,134) which is connected to said swing lever (24,124) and a continuous casting shell (14,114) which can be impinged upon by a cooling medium. A bearing (38,138) to support the continuous cast shell (14,114) is pivotally mounted on the swing lever (24,124) around a second pivotal axis, whereby at least one connection for the cooling medium is integrated into the pivoting bearing (38,138).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2006.01); B22D 11/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/053 (2013.01); B22D 11/043 (2013.01); B22D 11/055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853935 A1 19981203; AT 206334 T 20011015; AU 8106998 A 19981230; BR 9809887 A 20000627; CN 1072048 C 20011003; CN 1258238 A 20000628; DE 59801647 D1 20011108; EP 0984836 A1 20000315; EP 0984836 B1 20011004; ES 2161540 T3 20011201; JP 2002500565 A 20020108; KR 20010013196 A 20010226; LU 90071 A2 19981201; PL 337041 A1 20000731; US 6298905 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2005-05-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050528

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-05-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161540 T3

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801647 20011108

2001-10-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2001-10-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206334 T 20011015

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT