Global Patent Index - EP 0984838 A1

EP 0984838 A1 2000-03-15 - SUBMERGED NOZZLE FOR SLAB CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULDS

Title (en)

SUBMERGED NOZZLE FOR SLAB CONTINUOUS CASTING MOULDS

Title (de)

TAUCHAUSGUSS FÜR BRAMMEN-STRANGGIESSKOKILLE

Title (fr)

BUSETTE DE COULEE PAR IMMERSION POUR COQUILLE DE COULEE CONTINUE DE BRAMES

Publication

EP 0984838 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934799 A

Priority

  • DE 9801438 W
  • DE 19722890 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722890A1] The invention relates to a submerged nozzle of a metallurgic vessel, said vessel being situated upstream of a continuous casting mould. Said submerged nozzle is configured as a single-piece unit and has a slit-shaped discharge opening in the mouth area, the length of said opening being several times longer than it is wide. The submerged nozzle (21) has a cylindrical form with a circular (R), oval (r or c) or bone-shaped (p or q) cross-section, and the slit-shaped discharge opening (22) is configured as a through slit (23) which extends in the base (28) and into the side wall (29) of the cylindrical part of the submerged nozzle (21). The invention also relates to a method for producing a submerged nozzle of this type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/50; B22D 41/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/50 (2006.01); B22D 41/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/52 (2013.01); B22D 41/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853938A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722890 A1 19981203; AU 8431598 A 19981230; BR 9810736 A 20000912; EP 0984838 A1 20000315; EP 0984838 B1 20040915; KR 100537467 B1 20051216; KR 20010013067 A 20010226; TW 370477 B 19990921; US 6336575 B1 20020108; WO 9853938 A1 19981203; ZA 9804536 B 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140520

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140520

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811952

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140520

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811952

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-09-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811952 P 20041021

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2004-09-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040915

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991013

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT LU NL