Global patent index - EP 0984850 A2

EP 0984850 A2 2000-03-15 - CUTTING TOOL, ESPECIALLY PLANE BLADE HEAD OR PLANE BLADE SHAFT

Title (en)

CUTTING TOOL, ESPECIALLY PLANE BLADE HEAD OR PLANE BLADE SHAFT

Title (de)

SCHNEIDWERKZEUG, INSBESONDERE HOBELMESSERKOPF ODER HOBELMESSERWELLE

Title (fr)

OUTIL COUPANT, NOTAMMENT TETE DE FER DE RABOT OU BIEN ARBRE DE FER DE RABOT

Publication

EP 0984850 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99924694 A

Priority

  • DE 9900919 W
  • DE 19813084 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813084C1] The invention relates to a cutting tool, especially a plane blade head or plane blade shaft, comprising a supporting body (1) having at least one recess (3) which is open radially to the outside, a wedge-shaped clamping jaw (4) housed in the recess (3) and a blade (6) which can be fixed in its seat by means of the clamping jaw (4). For positioning the blade (6) the clamping jaw (4) is pretensioned by a compression spring (13) and for removing the blade (6) the clamping jaw (4) can be displaced radially inwards against the force of the compression spring (13), whereby the clamping jaw (4) automatically self-locks in its radial inner position. The invention is characterized in that to permit the automatic self-locking of the clamping jaw (4) it provides for a spring-loaded bolt (7) which engages a recess (22) provided for in the clamping jaw (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27G 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27G 13/04 (2013.01); Y10T 83/9372 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9464 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948655A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813084 C1 19981224; AT 231775 T 20030215; BR 9904884 A 20001219; EP 0984850 A2 20000315; EP 0984850 B1 20030129; US 6279444 B1 20010828; WO 9948655 A2 19990930; WO 9948655 A3 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59904141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59904141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140401

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130325

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130325

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130325

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 231775

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130325

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59904141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEITZ GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB