Global Patent Index - EP 0984860 A1

EP 0984860 A1 2000-03-15 - CYLINDER WITH A RUBBER LINER AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING SAID LINER

Title (en)

CYLINDER WITH A RUBBER LINER AND DEVICE FOR APPLYING SAID LINER

Title (de)

WALZE MIT EINEM GUMMIBELAG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES GUMMIBELAGES

Title (fr)

ROULEAU A GARNITURE EN CAOUTCHOUC ET DISPOSITIF POUR APPLIQUER UNE GARNITURE EN CAOUTCHOUC

Publication

EP 0984860 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934820 A

Priority

  • DE 9801462 W
  • DE 19723123 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855314A1] The rubber sheet (13) over its complete under side is adhered to the roller basic body (8). An abutment line (17) is formed between the commencement (14) and end (16) of the rubber sheet (13) and runs at an angle greater than 0 degrees and equal to/smaller than 6 degrees to an axis-parallel line on the upper surface (12) of the roller basic body (8). The rubber sheet can be self-adhesive or applied to a roller basic body provided with adhesive. It is cover-shaped in its application to the surface of the roller basic body. The commencement and end of the rubber body locate on one another in blunt abutment. For application of the rubber lining an adjustable carrier (23) is provided on the surface of the roller basic body. -

[origin: WO9855314A1] The invention relates to an inking cylinder or moistening cylinder (3) with a fixed rubber liner (13) which is applied without any finishing so that a rubber blanket can be stuck thereon. The invention also relates to a device for applying said rubber liner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/24 (2006.01); B41F 31/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855314A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855314 A1 19981210; CN 1084257 C 20020508; CN 1259084 A 20000705; EP 0984860 A1 20000315; EP 0984860 B1 20020508; EP 1122065 A2 20010808; EP 1122065 A3 20020327; EP 1122065 B1 20030219; ES 2175736 T3 20021116; ES 2189776 T3 20030716; JP 2000512942 A 20001003; JP 3342876 B2 20021111; US 6339988 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060529

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060528

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060528

2005-05-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050509

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175736 T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804063 20020613

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CYLINDER WITH A RUBBER LINER

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI