Global Patent Index - EP 0984881 A1

EP 0984881 A1 2000-03-15 - DEVICE FOR LOCKING END POSITIONS OF MOBILE SWITCH PARTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LOCKING END POSITIONS OF MOBILE SWITCH PARTS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM VERRIEGELN DER ENDLAGEN VON BEWEGLICHEN WEICHENTEILEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE VERROUILLAGE EN POSITIONS EXTREMES DE PIECES D'AIGUILLE MOBILES

Publication

EP 0984881 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921269 A

Priority

  • AT 9800136 W
  • AT 90297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854041A1] The invention relates to a device for locking the stop positions of mobile switch parts, in particular a facing point lock, in which two elements, which can move axially in relation to each other, can be moved into a non-positive fit coupling position in at least one direction of movement. Said mobile elements comprise a tube (19, 40) and a rod (13) inserted in the tube (19, 40), and are arranged at least partially in a stationary outer tube (8). Locking elements formed by balls (17, 18, 19) interact with the axially mobile parts and the outer tube (8), and can be displaced radially into a locking position in a recess or inner ring groove of the outer tube (8). The balls (17, 18, 39) are encompassed by an expanding ring or by a ring composed of segments (22, 23, 51). The segments (22, 23, 51) or the ring are held elastically in a position having an outer diameter that is smaller than or equal to the outer diameter of the axially mobile tube (19, 430) inserted in the outer tube (8). These segments (22, 23, 51) or ring are immersed in a peripheral groove in the tube (19, 40). The balls (17, 18, 39) are fitted in openings in the tube (19, 40) between the rod (13) and the ring composed of segments (22, 23, 51).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854041A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854041 A1 19981203; AT 211981 T 20020215; AT 405925 B 19991227; AT A90297 A 19990515; AU 723839 B2 20000907; AU 7418498 A 19981230; CA 2291102 A1 19981203; CA 2291102 C 20031007; CN 1152799 C 20040609; CN 1257455 A 20000621; DE 59802642 D1 20020221; DK 0984881 T3 20020429; EE 9900534 A 20000615; EP 0984881 A1 20000315; EP 0984881 B1 20020116; ES 2171296 T3 20020901; HU 0003694 A2 20010228; HU 0003694 A3 20011029; HU 221054 B1 20020729; JP 2000512243 A 20000919; JP 3267304 B2 20020318; KR 20010013035 A 20010226; NO 313231 B1 20020902; NO 995761 A 19991124; NO 995761 D0 19991124; PL 187117 B1 20040531; PL 337029 A1 20000731; PT 984881 E 20020731; RU 2192983 C2 20021120; SK 155599 A3 20000711; US 6354541 B1 20020312; ZA 9804467 B 19981201

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160528

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-12-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160527

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150527

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-03-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020401131

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151127

2016-02-03 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-12-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802642

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401131

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171296 T3

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-04-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802642 20020221

2002-02-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991129;LV PAYMENT 19991129;RO PAYMENT 19991129;SI PAYMENT 19991129

2002-01-16 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2002-01-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211981 T 20020215

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991129;LV PAYMENT 19991129;RO PAYMENT 19991129;SI PAYMENT 19991129