Global Patent Index - EP 0984903 A1

EP 0984903 A1 2000-03-15 - REMOVAL OF TECHNETIUM IMPURITIES FROM URANIUM HEXAFLUORIDE

Title (en)

REMOVAL OF TECHNETIUM IMPURITIES FROM URANIUM HEXAFLUORIDE

Title (de)

ENTFERNUNG VON TECHNETIUMKONTAMINANTEN AUS URANHEXAFLUORID

Title (fr)

EXTRACTION D'IMPURETES DE TECHNETIUM D'HEXAFLUORURE D'URANIUM

Publication

EP 0984903 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98915443 A

Priority

  • US 9807163 W
  • US 86000097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5826163A] Processes for the removal of technetium from contaminated uranium hexafluoride containing technetium, typically as technetium-99 (99Tc) in nominal chemical forms are provided. The processes involve contacting the contaminated liquefied uranium hexafluoride with a metal fluoride, typically magnesium fluoride (MgF2), for a period of time sufficient for the technetium to become adsorbed onto the metal fluoride thereby producing a purified uranium hexafluoride liquid; and removing the purified uranium hexafluoride liquid from the metal fluoride having adsorbed technetium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01G 43/06; G21F 9/00; G21F 9/02; G21F 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21C 19/44 (2006.01); C01G 43/06 (2006.01); G21F 9/00 (2006.01); G21F 9/02 (2006.01); G21F 9/06 (2006.01); G21F 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 9/02 (2013.01); C01G 43/063 (2013.01); G21F 9/007 (2013.01); G21F 9/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5826163 A 19981020; AU 6962498 A 19981211; EP 0984903 A1 20000315; EP 0984903 A4 20050216; EP 0984903 B1 20120201; JP 2001525785 A 20011211; JP 4183759 B2 20081119; WO 9852872 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170405

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170404

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842583

- Effective date: 20121105

2013-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121105

2012-03-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842583

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 01G 43/06 A

2005-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21F 9/00 B

2005-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21F 9/02 B

2005-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21F 9/12 B

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB