Global Patent Index - EP 0984923 A1

EP 0984923 A1 2000-03-15 - O-BENZYL OXIME ETHERS AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (en)

O-BENZYL OXIME ETHERS AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (de)

O-BENZYLOXIMETHERDERIVATE UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS PESTIZIDE

Title (fr)

O-BENZYLE OXIME ETHERS ET UTILISATION DE CES COMPOSES COMME PESTICIDES

Publication

EP 0984923 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932081 A

Priority

  • CH 125197 A
  • EP 9803073 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854125A1] Compounds of formula (I), wherein <u>either</u> X is CH or N, Y is OR1 and Z is O, <u>or</u> X is N, Y is NHR8 and Z is O, S or S (=O); R1, R2 and R3 are as defined according to the specification; m is 0, 1 or 2; R5 is, for example, halogen, C1-C6alkyl, halo-C1-C6alkyl or C3-C6cycloalkyl; n is 0, 1, 2, 3 or 4; R9 is methyl, fluoromethyl or difluoromethyl; A and R7 are as defined according to the specification; D is O, S, -S(=O) or S(=O)2; G is C1-C8alkylene; T-R6 is R6, -C(=N-O-A1-R77)-R6; -SiR14(R15)-R6; -C(=O)-R6; -C(R16)=C(R17)-R6, -C=C-R6 or -D-R6; R6 is C1-C4alkyl or unsubstituted or substituted aryl or heteroaryl; A1 and R77 are as defined above for A and R7; L is U-R18, P(O)vR11R12, P(S)wR11R12 or N(aryl)R13; v and w are 0 or 1; U-R18 is -C(=O)-C(=O)-R18; -C(OH)-C(OH)-R18; -C(=N-O-A1-R7)-R18; (i) or (ii); a is 0 or 1; b is 0 or 1; R11, R12 and R13 are, for example, C1-C6alkyl, halo-C1-C6alkyl or C3-C6cycloalkyl; R14 and R15 are each independently of the other C1-C4alkyl; R16 and R17 are each independently of the other hydrogen, C1-C4alkyl or halogen and R18 is R5; and, where applicable, their possible E/Z isomers, mixtures of E/Z isomers and/or tautomers, in each case in free form or in salt form, a method of controlling pests, a process for the preparation of those compounds and their use are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 251/60; A01N 37/50; C07D 261/08; C07D 261/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 37/18 (2006.01); A01N 37/36 (2006.01); A01N 37/44 (2006.01); A01N 43/80 (2006.01); A01N 57/22 (2006.01); C07C 251/60 (2006.01); C07D 261/08 (2006.01); C07D 261/20 (2006.01); C07F 9/32 (2006.01); C07F 9/40 (2006.01); C07F 9/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 9/4021 (2013.01); C07C 251/60 (2013.01); C07D 261/08 (2013.01); C07D 261/20 (2013.01); C07F 9/3229 (2013.01); C07F 9/5325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854125A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854125 A1 19981203; AU 8210298 A 19981230; EP 0984923 A1 20000315; JP 2002501515 A 20020115

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030729

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE