Global Patent Index - EP 0984924 A1

EP 0984924 A1 2000-03-15 - O-BENZYL OXIME ETHER DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (en)

O-BENZYL OXIME ETHER DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES

Title (de)

O-BENZYLOXIMETHERDERIVATE UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS PESTIZIDE

Title (fr)

DERIVES D'O-BENZYLE OXIME ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PESTICIDES

Publication

EP 0984924 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932082 A

Priority

  • CH 125297 A
  • EP 9803074 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854126A1] Described are compounds of formula (I), wherein either X is CH or N, Y is OR1 and Z is O, or X is N, Y is NHR8 and Z is O, S or S(=O); R1 is C1-C4alkyl; R2 is C2-C4alkyl or C3-C6cycloalkyl; R3 and R4 are each independently of the other, for example, H, C1-C4alkyl or C1-C4-alkoxy; R8 is H or C1-C4alkyl; R9 is methyl, fluoromethyl or difluoromethyl; A is a direct bond, C1-C10alkylene, -C(=O)-, -C(=S)- or halo-C1-C10alkylene and R7 is a radical R10; or A is C1-C10alkylene, -C(=O)-, -C(=S)- or halo-C1-C10alkylene and R7 is -CN, OR10, N(R10)2 or -S(=O)pR10; p is 0, 1 or 2; G is O, S or -O-CH2-; R5 and R6 are each inter alia unsubstituted or substituted C1-C6alkyl, C3-C6cycloalkyl, C1-C6alkoxy, C1-C6alkylthio, C1-C6alkylsulfynyl, C1-C6alkylsulfonyl or C1-C6alkylsulfonyloxy and R10 is H or, for example, unsubstituted or substituted C1-C6alkyl, C2-C8alkenyl, C2-C8-alkynyl or C3-C6cycloalkyl; a process for the preparation of those compounds and their use; pesticides, the active ingredient of which is selected from those compounds; and a method of preparing those compositions and their use; intermediates in the preparation of those compounds; and a process for the preparation of those intermediates and their use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 251/60; A01N 37/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 37/18 (2006.01); A01N 37/36 (2006.01); A01N 37/44 (2006.01); C07C 251/48 (2006.01); C07C 251/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 251/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854126A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854126 A1 19981203; AR 015821 A1 20010530; AU 8210398 A 19981230; BR 9809527 A 20000620; CN 1261874 A 20000802; CO 5040224 A1 20010529; EG 21742 A 20020227; EP 0984924 A1 20000315; ID 24593 A 20000727; JP 2001526704 A 20011218; MA 24555 A1 19981231; TR 9902910 T2 20000721; TW 474907 B 20020201; ZA 9804462 B 19981127

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE