Global Patent Index - EP 0985016 A1

EP 0985016 A1 2000-03-15 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NONIONIC SURFACTANT GRANULE

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING NONIONIC SURFACTANT GRANULE

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND NICHTIONISCHES TENSIDGRANULAT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES CONTENANT DES GRANULES TENSIOACTIVES NON IONIQUES

Publication

EP 0985016 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930715 A

Priority

  • EP 9802983 W
  • GB 9711353 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854281A1] A particulate detergent composition is composed of at least two different granular components, one of which is a nonionic-surfactant-containing granular component characterised in that it comprises more than 55 % by weight of nonionic surfactant, at least 5 % by weight of silica having an oil absorption capacity of at least 1.0 ml/g and, optionally, less than 10 % by weight of aluminosilicate. Preferably, the composition also contains a spray-dried or agglomerated detergent base powder containing surfactant and builder, or a granule containing a high concentration of anionic surfactant, a builder granule, or any combination of these.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 17/00; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0034 (2013.01); C11D 11/0082 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854281A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854281 A1 19981203; AR 015701 A1 20010516; AU 8105598 A 19981230; BR 9809889 A 20000704; CA 2291638 A1 19981203; DE 69802188 D1 20011129; DE 69802188 T2 20020314; EP 0985016 A1 20000315; EP 0985016 B1 20011024; ES 2166168 T3 20020401; GB 9711353 D0 19970730; IN 190311 B 20030712; TR 200000109 T2 20000821; ZA 9804217 B 19991119

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120512

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120511

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120511

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120511

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-02 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-05-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SUED-CHEMIE AG

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SUED-CHEMIE AG

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166168

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-29

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT