Global patent index - EP 0985019 A1

EP 0985019 A1 2000-03-15 - BLEACHING SYSTEM

Title (en)

BLEACHING SYSTEM

Title (de)

BLEICHSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BLANCHIMENT

Publication

EP 0985019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928290 A

Priority

  • DE 19721886 A
  • EP 9802920 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721886A1] The invention relates to a bleaching system comprising an enzyme producing hydrogen peroxide and a transition metal compound. The inventive system is characterized in that an enzyme producing hydrogen peroxide from atmospheric oxygen is covalently bonded to the transition metal compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/386; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/39; C11D 3/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/38654 (2013.01); C11D 3/3932 (2013.01); C11D 3/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854282A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721886 A1 19981203; AT 210178 T 20011215; EP 0985019 A1 20000315; EP 0985019 B1 20011205; ES 2169525 T3 20020701; JP 2001526729 A 20011218; US 6479450 B1 20021112; WO 9854282 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050519

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050518

2004-07-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040518

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040505

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2169525

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-04-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802351

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 210178

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL