Global patent index - EP 0985054 A1

EP 0985054 A1 2000-03-15 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURE OF A STEEL BAND FOR DRAWING WITH IMPROVED SURFACE PROPERTIES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTINUOUS MANUFACTURE OF A STEEL BAND FOR DRAWING WITH IMPROVED SURFACE PROPERTIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLEN VON STAHLBAND MIT VERBESSERTEN OBERFLÄCHENEIGENSCHAFTEN ZUM TIEFZIEHEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION EN CONTINU D'UNE BANDE EN ACIER POUR EMBOUTISSAGE PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES DE SURFACE AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 0985054 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98916676 A

Priority

  • BE 9800061 W
  • BE 9700459 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854371A1] The invention concerns a method for continuous manufacture of a steel band for drawing with improved surface properties, whereby a band, after being hot rolled and coiled at the end of the rolling process at a temperature ranging between 500 and 800 DEG C, and cold rolled with a reduction ratio of at least 30 % and preferably 75 %, is subjected to a heating step, then a thermal treatment hereafter called reactive annealing, for producing re-crystallisation, i.e. regeneration of the crystal lattice following deformation, and carburizing of the band at a temperature T, simultaneously or not depending on the final properties required for the band, and finally said band is cooled. The invention is characterised in that said reactive annealing is wholly or partially carried out under a gaseous atmosphere comprising at least CO and H2 in concentrations by volume corresponding to the following relationship: [ % vol H2] + 2 [ % vol CO] - 80 >/=0, at least H2O and CO2 in concentrations not more than 3 % by volume, a remainder of a neutral gas such as N2, and the carburizing temperature T ranges between 650 and 950 DEG C, and the total duration t of said reactive annealing thermal treatment is between 0.1 and 300 seconds and the carburizing rate is not less than 10<(-10)>.exp(T/100)g.cm(-2).s(-1), in which T is the carburizing temperature expressed in Kelvin's.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04; C21D 9/48; C23C 8/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C23C 8/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/22 (2013.01); C21D 8/0457 (2013.01); C21D 8/0426 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854371A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854371 A1 19981203; BE 1011178 A3 19990601; DE 69802525 D1 20011220; DE 69802525 T2 20020627; EP 0985054 A1 20000315; EP 0985054 B1 20011114

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140428

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-11-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140428

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69802525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130722

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802525

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-20

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991001

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL