Global Patent Index - EP 0985064 A2

EP 0985064 A2 2000-03-15 - ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE TO DISCRIMINATE FALSE CONTACTS AND SIGNAL TEMPORARY CONTACTS IN A LOOM WARP STOP MOTION DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE TO DISCRIMINATE FALSE CONTACTS AND SIGNAL TEMPORARY CONTACTS IN A LOOM WARP STOP MOTION DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES STEUERGERÄT ZUR UNTERSCHEIDING ZWISCHEN FALSCHEN KONTAKTEN UND ZEITWEILIGEN KONTAKTEN IN EINER KETTENFADENWÄCHTERVORRICHTUNG FÜR WEBMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE DESTINE A DISTINGUER DE FAUX CONTACTS ET A SIGNALER DES CONTACTS TEMPORAIRES DANS UN DISPOSITIF CASSE-CHAINE DE METIER

Publication

EP 0985064 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98938598 A

Priority

  • EP 9803207 W
  • IT MI971263 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854384A2] Electronic control device to discriminate the false contacts and to signal the temporary contacts in a warp stop motion device of a loom. Said control device allows to discriminate the temporary closing of the electric circuits of the banks determined by electrostatic phenomena, from those determined by temporary contacts of the drop wires, detecting the presence or absence, for a predetermined number of successive cycles, of the electric signals existing on the circuits of the banks, by means of a high-frequency synchronous time sampling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 51/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854384A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854384 A2 19981203; WO 9854384 A3 19990304; CN 1086004 C 20020605; CN 1261413 A 20000726; DE 69808458 D1 20021107; DE 69808458 T2 20031204; EP 0985064 A2 20000315; EP 0985064 B1 20021002; IT 1292032 B1 19990125; IT MI971263 A1 19981130; IT MI971263 D0 19970529; JP 2001526746 A 20011218; KR 100558224 B1 20060310; KR 20010013113 A 20010226; TW 378235 B 20000101

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.

- Free text: F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.#VIA BORGO PALAZZO, 69#24125 BERGAMO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.#VIA BORGO PALAZZO, 69#24125 BERGAMO (IT)

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-03-27 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.

- Free text: ACTEX S.P.A.#VIA BORGO PALAZZO, 69#24100 BERGAMO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- F.I.R.S.T. S.P.A.#VIA BORGO PALAZZO, 69#24125 BERGAMO (IT)

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808458 20021107

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010702

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI