Global Patent Index - EP 0985068 A1

EP 0985068 A1 2000-03-15 - DEVICE FOR DEHYDRATING AND WASHING SUSPENSIONS OF FIBROUS MATERIAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DEHYDRATING AND WASHING SUSPENSIONS OF FIBROUS MATERIAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTWÄSSERUNG UND WÄSCHE VON FASERSTOFFSUSPENSIONEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DESHYDRATATION ET DE LAVAGE DE SUSPENSIONS DE MATIERE FIBREUSE

Publication

EP 0985068 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928237 A

Priority

  • AT 89097 A
  • EP 9802720 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854401A1] The invention relates to a device for dehydrating and washing suspensions of fibrous material, comprising two rollers (2, 3) turning in opposite directions, a material feeding element (4, 5) and a material discharge element (6). Said device is principally characterized in that in the case of both rollers (2, 3) the material feeding element (4, 5) is arranged separately in the lower area of said rollers (2, 3), that a discharging endless screw (6) is arranged below the gap between the two rollers (2, 3) for discharging the filtration mat and that a washing zone (9", 10") is provided in the upper area of the rollers (2, 3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21D 1/40; D21F 1/78; D21C 9/18; D21C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/06 (2006.01); D21C 9/18 (2006.01); D21D 1/40 (2006.01); D21F 1/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21D 1/40 (2013.01); B30B 9/20 (2013.01); D21C 9/06 (2013.01); D21C 9/18 (2013.01); D21F 1/78 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854401 A1 19981203; AT 405420 B 19990825; AT A89097 A 19981215; AU 8016298 A 19981230; CA 2290972 A1 19981203; CA 2290972 C 20061212; DE 59802544 D1 20020131; EP 0985068 A1 20000315; EP 0985068 B1 20011219; US 6311849 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802544

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120510

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120509

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802544 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI SE

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDRITZ AG

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI SE