Global patent index - EP 0985074 A1

EP 0985074 A1 2000-03-15 - STRIPPING ELEMENT

Title (en)

STRIPPING ELEMENT

Title (de)

ABSCHALELEMENT

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE DECOFFRAGE

Publication

EP 0985074 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928231 A

Priority

  • DE 19722449 A
  • EP 9802690 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722449A1] The invention relates to a stripping element for separating a concreting section into part-sections. The inventive stripping element has a strip-like shape and its width corresponds to the thickness of the concreting section. Said stripping element consists of at least one strip-shaped forming lath (1, 20). Said forming lath (1, 20) consists of a thin-walled sheet-type material, so that after the concreting section has been cast, the forming lath (1, 20) can remain between the cast part-sections. The forming lath (1, 20) preferably has recesses (5) through which reinforcement struts (6) can extend, so that the inventive stripping element can even be used when the reinforcement struts (6) of a reinforcement element need to cross said stripping element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/68 (2006.01); E04G 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6816 (2013.01); E04B 1/6806 (2013.01); E04B 1/6807 (2013.01); E04G 11/085 (2013.01); Y10T 403/475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854424A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722449 A1 19981203; AU 8015698 A 19981230; CA 2290826 A1 19981203; CA 2290826 C 20060725; EP 0985074 A1 20000315; EP 1632621 A2 20060308; EP 1632621 A3 20070321; US 6289645 B1 20010918; WO 9854424 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025373

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-03-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20051128

2006-03-15 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18W

2006-03-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20051128

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991014

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE