Global patent index - EP 0985076 A1

EP 0985076 A1 2000-03-15 - A PLATE-TUMBLER LOCK COMBINED WITH A KEY HAVING A CORRESPONDINGLY NOTCHED SHANK

Title (en)

A PLATE-TUMBLER LOCK COMBINED WITH A KEY HAVING A CORRESPONDINGLY NOTCHED SHANK

Title (de)

EIN MIT ZUHALTUNGSPLÄTTCHEN AUSGESTATTETES SCHLIESSZYLINDERSCHLOSS IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM MIT EINEM PASSEND GEKERBTEN BART VERSEHENEN SCHLÜSSEL

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE COMPORTANT UNE SERRURE Ä PAILLETTES ET UNE CLE CORRESPONDANTE A QUEUE CRANTEE

Publication

EP 0985076 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98928372 A

Priority

  • FR 9801064 W
  • FR 9706554 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763980A1] The invention concerns a tumbler lock with additional rotor locking member comprising a rotor (2) rotating in a stator (1) bore. The invention is characterised in that the lock comprises a slide (4) movable transversely to the key channel, said slide (4) comprising a key passage orifice (41) and a projection (42) co-operating with a stator (1) housing (11) in a position locking the rotor (2) rotation and elastically returned in said locking position by elastic return means (5), said slide (4) having at least a notch co-operating with a key member so as to drive said slide transversely towards a position unlocking the rotor (2) rotation. The invention is applicable to tumbler lock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 29/004 (2013.01); Y10T 70/7554 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7599 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7734 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854427A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763980 A1 19981204; FR 2763980 B1 19990730; DE 69830907 D1 20050825; EP 0985076 A1 20000315; EP 0985076 B1 20050720; US 6196038 B1 20010306; WO 9854427 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RONIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-09-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-08-31 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: DB1

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69830907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RONIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-02-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: A PLATE-TUMBLER LOCK COMBINED WITH A KEY HAVING A CORRESPONDINGLY NOTCHED SHANK

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020402

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT