Global Patent Index - EP 0985081 A1

EP 0985081 A1 2000-03-15 - DRILLING TOOL

Title (en)

DRILLING TOOL

Title (de)

BOHRWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL DE PER AGE

Publication

EP 0985081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934749 A

Priority

  • DE 9801377 W
  • DE 19722517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722517A1] The invention relates to a drilling tool, especially a rock drill, comprising a drill head, a clamping stem, and a helical stem situated in-between. The aim of the invention is to provide an economical drilling tool. To this end, the base element is a polygonal rod which is twisted in the area of the helical stem.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/445 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854436A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722517 A1 19981203; CN 1259189 A 20000705; DK 0985081 T3 20030217; EP 0985081 A1 20000315; EP 0985081 B1 20021113; WO 9854436 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050515

2005-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2004-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-02-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806280 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-07-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF A ROCK DRILL

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT