Global Patent Index - EP 0985082 A1

EP 0985082 A1 2000-03-15 - TUNNEL-BORING MACHINE

Title (en)

TUNNEL-BORING MACHINE

Title (de)

TUNNELBOHRMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A PERCER DES TUNNELS

Publication

EP 0985082 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934751 A

Priority

  • DE 9801382 W
  • DE 19722000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722000A1] The invention relates to a tunnel-boring machine (100) for driving a tunnel bore optionally in open or shielded mode. The inventive tunnel-boring machine comprises a shield tail (33), said shield tail being connected to a bore head (10) and optionally covering the bore walling over a set length, a bracing device which can optionally be fixed in the tunnel bore, an advancement device (25) which can be operated optionally, said advancement device resting on said bracing device (25) and acting on the bore head (10), and a device for generating power (35) which has a variable length, rests on a tubbing (32) and acts on the bore head (10) and which can also be operated optionally. An inner kelly (16) is provided for introducing the driving forces into the bore head (10) during open mode, said kelly being moveable in the direction of boring in relation to the bracing device (20). The advancement device (25) is linked to the kelly and the bore head (10) is supported at the working end of said kelly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/10; E21D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/06 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/0621 (2013.01); E21D 9/1093 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854442A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722000 A1 19981203; AT 213807 T 20020315; AU 738574 B2 20010920; AU 8430198 A 19981230; BR 9809164 A 20000801; CA 2291043 A1 19981203; EP 0985082 A1 20000315; EP 0985082 B1 20020227; KR 20010013098 A 20010226; US 6431653 B1 20020813; WO 9854442 A1 19981203; ZA 9804521 B 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-12-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-08-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-05-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020519

2002-05-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020503

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803200 20020404

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

2002-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213807 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010608

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE