Global patent index - EP 0985087 A1

EP 0985087 A1 2000-03-15 - HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM WITH CONSTANT PRESSURE IN PRESSURE CONDUIT

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC DRIVE SYSTEM WITH CONSTANT PRESSURE IN PRESSURE CONDUIT

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHER ANTRIEB MIT KONSTANTEM DRUCK IN EINER DRUCKLEITUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYDRAULIQUE A PRESSION CONSTANTE DANS UN CONDUIT DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0985087 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925972 A

Priority

  • NL 9800305 W
  • NL 1006143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854450A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic drive system for driving hydromotors. The hydromotors may be loaded with variable loads and are coupled via hydraulic transformers with the pressure conduit which is substantially maintained at a constant pressure by means of a pump. The pump is provided with switch means by which the delivery of the pump can be alternately activated and inactivated, allowing of the pump's delivery to be varied quickly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 71/04; F04B 49/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 71/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/04 (2006.01); F04B 49/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/032 (2013.01); F02B 71/045 (2013.01); F02B 75/04 (2013.01); F04B 49/22 (2013.01); F15B 2211/212 (2013.01); F15B 2211/214 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854450A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854450 A1 19981203; DE 69817343 D1 20030925; DE 69817343 T2 20040624; EP 0985087 A1 20000315; EP 0985087 B1 20030820; NL 1006143 C2 19981201

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060527

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69817343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010521

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL