Global Patent Index - EP 0985089 A1

EP 0985089 A1 2000-03-15 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE NOTAMMENT POUR UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0985089 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923374 A

Priority

  • DE 9900827 W
  • DE 19813379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813379A1] The present invention relates to an internal combustion engine (1) which is mainly intended for a motor vehicle. The engine comprises an injection valve (8) for directly injecting fuel into a combustion chamber (4) either during an inlet phase according to a first operation mode or during a compression phase according to a second operation mode. A regulation device (16) is also provided for controlling and/or adjusting the amount of fuel injected into the combustion chamber (4) in a different manner for each operation mode. The regulation device (16) ensures, in a first step (26), the transition from the first operation mode to a second mode intermediate operation and then to a second mode normal operation (31, 37).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02P 5/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/307 (2013.01); F02D 41/1475 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01); F02P 5/1504 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949198A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813379 A1 19991007; BR 9904889 A 20000919; EP 0985089 A1 20000315; EP 0985089 B1 20031001; JP 2002500723 A 20020108; US 6792913 B1 20040921; WO 9949198 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907168 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030115

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB