Global Patent Index - EP 0985092 A1

EP 0985092 A1 2000-03-15 - EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION DEVICE

Title (en)

EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION DEVICE

Title (de)

ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RECYCLAGE DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 0985092 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925637 A

Priority

  • DE 19721993 A
  • EP 9803092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721993A1] The invention relates to an exhaust gas recirculation device for recirculating exhaust gases in a gas supply line of an engine, specially a motor vehicle engine, comprising an exhaust gas supply line (5), a fresh gas supply line (2) and an outlet port (4), wherein at least the exhaust gas supply line (5) and the fresh gas supply line (2) are interconnected by means of a control member (69) to measure exhaust gas levels and a pressure plate (44) is arranged on the side of the control member (69) facing the fresh gas supply line. Said pressure plate minimizes the influence of fluctuations in pressure occurring in the exhaust and fresh gas lines and affecting the exhaust gas flow rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/67 (2016.02); F02M 26/53 (2016.02); F02M 26/70 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854460A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721993 A1 19981217; AT 222324 T 20020815; EP 0985092 A1 20000315; EP 0985092 B1 20020814; ES 2178837 T3 20030101; WO 9854460 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805195

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090526

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070526

2006-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178837 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805195 20020919

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222324 T 20020815

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991014

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT