Global Patent Index - EP 0985093 A1

EP 0985093 A1 2000-03-15 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX

Publication

EP 0985093 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913514 A

Priority

  • DE 9800500 W
  • DE 19722143 A
  • DE 19725564 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854465A1] The invention relates to a radial piston pump, of which at least one piston is housed in the pump casing, while the cylinder is moved by an eccentric shaft for fluid admission. This design principle enables coaxial arrangement of the intake and oulet valves at short distance of the crank housing, resulting in the flow of the fuel supply circuit being reduced to a minimum. Such a system is particularly suitable for high pressure gasoline pumps.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F04B 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0421 (2013.01); F04B 1/0452 (2013.01); F04B 1/053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854465A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854465 A1 19981203; EP 0985093 A1 20000315; EP 0985093 B1 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806056 20021128

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT