Global Patent Index - EP 0985098 A1

EP 0985098 A1 2000-03-15 - CENTRIFUGAL PUMP WITH INFLOW GUIDE DEVICE

Title (en)

CENTRIFUGAL PUMP WITH INFLOW GUIDE DEVICE

Title (de)

KREISELPUMPE MIT EINER EINLAUFLEITEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE CENTRIFUGE A DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE D'ADMISSION

Publication

EP 0985098 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925611 A

Priority

  • DE 19722353 A
  • EP 9802908 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722353A1] The invention relates to a centrifugal pump having an axial inlet and an inflow guide device mounted upstream of the impeller, which guide device comprises several rigid guiding blade wheels, which on the side facing the impeller each have an edge pointing towards or away from the direction of rotation of the impeller. Said edge pointing towards or away from the direction of rotation is embodied by a twisted blade (8) positioned in the area of the wall of the inlet (2), is shaped against the guiding blade wheel (6) and is radially shorter than the guiding blade wheel (6). This raises the effectiveness of the pump and achieves an effect which increases the availability of the turbomachine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/448 (2013.01); F04D 29/4273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854471A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722353 A1 19981203; EP 0985098 A1 20000315; EP 0985098 B1 20030502; ES 2196563 T3 20031216; JP 2001526757 A 20011218; JP 3802572 B2 20060726; US 6273677 B1 20010814; WO 9854471 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100518

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196563 T3

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KSB A.G.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808172 P 20030605

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990901

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL