Global patent index - EP 0985125 A2

EP 0985125 A2 2000-03-15 - SELF-LOADING PISTOL, CONVERSION KIT FOR LOCKING SELF-LOADING PISTOLS AND WEAPONS SYSTEM FOR ASSEMBLING OPTIONALLY A LOCKING OR NON-LOCKING SELF-LOADING PISTOL

Title (en)

SELF-LOADING PISTOL, CONVERSION KIT FOR LOCKING SELF-LOADING PISTOLS AND WEAPONS SYSTEM FOR ASSEMBLING OPTIONALLY A LOCKING OR NON-LOCKING SELF-LOADING PISTOL

Title (de)

SELBSTLADEPISTOLE, UMRÜSTBAUSATZ FÜR VERRIEGELTE SELBSTLADEPISTOLE UND WAFFENSYSTEM AUS EINER WAHLWEISE VERRIEGELTEN ODER UNVERRIEGELTEN SELBSTLADEPISTOLE

Title (fr)

PISTOLET MITRAILLEUR, ENSEMBLE DE TRANSFORMATION POUR PISTOLET MITRAILLEUR AVEC VERROUILLAGE DE LA CULASSE, ET ARME POUVANT ETRE AU CHOIX UN PISTOLET MITRAILLEUR AVEC OU SANS VERROUILLAGE DE LA CULASSE

Publication

EP 0985125 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98937429 A

Priority

  • DE 19722806 A
  • EP 9803213 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722806C1] The barrel (3') is fixed to the grip, while behind it a breech-block slides between the open and shut positions. A multi-start coil-spring (19') thrusts the block into the shut position, and in the open one is so compressed that all its turns bear against each other. A close-fitting elastomer sleeve encloses the spring, and is of the same length as the latter when in the compressed state. The spring can be of flat wire or steel strip of oblong rectangular cross-section, and the sleeve can fit in a bore in the grip. An interchangeable barrel can be fixed in the grip, together with an elastomer sleeve. The breech-block can also be replaced by one of different weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 3/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 3/86 (2006.01); F41A 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 11/02 (2013.01); F41A 3/86 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854532A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722806 C1 19980903; AT 246795 T 20030815; EP 0985125 A2 20000315; EP 0985125 B1 20030806; US 6314859 B1 20011113; WO 9854532 A2 19981203; WO 9854532 A3 19990304

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080529

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080529

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080529

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080529

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809219

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WEICHERT, BERTHOLD

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAUCH, ERNST

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BANTLE, HANS-PETER

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WELDLE, HELMUT

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL