Global Patent Index - EP 0985129 A1

EP 0985129 A1 2000-03-15 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CARTRIDGE CONSISTING OF A CASE AND A PROJECTILE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CARTRIDGE CONSISTING OF A CASE AND A PROJECTILE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PATRONE AUS EINER HÜLSE UND EINEM GESCHOSS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTOUCHE CONSTITUEE D'UNE DOUILLE ET D'UN PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 0985129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936290 A

Priority

  • DE 19722564 A
  • EP 9803151 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854537A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a cartridge consisting of a case and a projectile, characterized in that, once the cartridge is fully manufactured, a capillary active, acrylate-based adhesive sealing agent is applied in a controlled manner to the gap arising in the inner mouth of the case when the projectile is inserted therein, in a sufficient quantity as to guarantee full sealing of said gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 5/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09J 133/04 (2006.01); F42B 3/00 (2006.01); F42B 5/067 (2006.01); F42B 5/18 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F42B (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854537A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854537 A1 19981203; AT 246797 T 20030815; CA 2291751 A1 19981203; CA 2291751 C 20051206; DE 19823971 A1 19981203; DE 59809221 D1 20030911; EP 0985129 A1 20000315; EP 0985129 B1 20030806; ES 2205526 T3 20040501; IL 133167 A 20040512; IL 133167 D0 20010319; IS 2299 B 20071015; IS 5242 A 19991109; NO 317644 B1 20041129; NO 995759 A 19991124; NO 995759 D0 19991124; PT 985129 E 20031128; US 2002088366 A1 20020711; US 6367386 B1 20020409; US 6584909 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160718

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205526 T3

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404380

2003-11-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809221 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-08-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUAG AMMOTEC GMBH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE