Global Patent Index - EP 0985179 A1

EP 0985179 A1 2000-03-15 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, PREFERABLY AN ELECTRONIC BOOK

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC DEVICE, PREFERABLY AN ELECTRONIC BOOK

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT, VORZUGSWEISE EIN ELEKTRONISCHES BUCH

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE, DE PREFERENCE UN LIVRE ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 0985179 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903576 A

Priority

  • CH 9900084 W
  • CH 45998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944144A1] The electronic device (8) is provided with a housing (9), a display (10), inputting means, a microprocessor, a control unit, a memory, a source of energy and one or more interfaces for exchanging data with a peripheral device. The display (10) is preferably an LCD display and is dimensioned in such a way as to resemble a page of a normal-sized book. The display (10) is also integrated in a flat, frame-shaped housing (9). The inputting means for the control unit of the device are configured as a touch screen on the display (10). A station (15) for receiving and transmitting signals over a radio network enables electronic data such as e-mails, telefaxes, Internet data etc. to be exchanged. Said data can then be visualised on the display (10). The advantages of the inventive electronic device are that it can be configured to be very light and easy to handle, is universal and still has a relatively large display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/16 (2006.01); G06F 15/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04N 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/0283 (2013.01); Y10S 345/901 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944144A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944144 A1 19990902; AU 2407499 A 19990915; AU 762534 B2 20030626; CA 2286205 A1 19990902; CA 2286205 C 20090505; CN 1161699 C 20040811; CN 1256770 A 20000614; EP 0985179 A1 20000315; IL 132183 A 20040620; IL 132183 D0 20010319; JP 2001525096 A 20011204; KR 100572778 B1 20060419; NO 995201 A 19991216; NO 995201 D0 19991025; RU 2224283 C2 20040220; TR 9902650 T1 20010621; US 6335678 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-20 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20101117

2006-09-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026493

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030415

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE