Global patent index - EP 0985187 A1

EP 0985187 A1 2000-03-15 - EXTENSIVE REQUEST SERVER

Title (en)

EXTENSIVE REQUEST SERVER

Title (de)

ANBIETER FÜR GENERALISIERTE ANFORDERUNGEN

Title (fr)

SERVEUR DE REQUETES GENERALISEES

Publication

EP 0985187 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909070 A

Priority

  • FR 9900668 W
  • FR 9803601 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776789A1] The invention concerns an extensive request server characterised in that it enables to query, through requests, different data sources (SD) from a single parameterable interface capable of being activated by applications and administration modules, a request being modelled in a management information base (MIB) in the form of a main object (OP) comprising the type of the source to be queried and an attribute of said type, and subordinate input (OE) or output (OS) objects, said input objects (OE) defining each a parameter (PE), said output objects (OS) defining each a result-variable (VR).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30398 (2013.01); H04L 41/0213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949401A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776789 A1 19991001; FR 2776789 B1 20010413; EP 0985187 A1 20000315; WO 9949401 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVIDIAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041108

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT