Global Patent Index - EP 0985222 A1

EP 0985222 A1 2000-03-15 - ELECTRON-EMITTING DEVICE HAVING SPECIALLY CONFIGURED FOCUS COATING AND FABRICATION OF SUCH A DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRON-EMITTING DEVICE HAVING SPECIALLY CONFIGURED FOCUS COATING AND FABRICATION OF SUCH A DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRONENEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER SPEZIELLEN FOKUSSCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF EMETTEUR D'ELECTRONS A REVETEMENT DE FOCALISATION SPECIALEMENT CONFIGURE ET FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0985222 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928822 A

Priority

  • US 9809906 W
  • US 86655497 A
  • US 86615197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854745A1] An electron-emitting device contains an electron focusing system (37 or 37A) formed with a base focusing structure (38 or 38A) and a focus coating (39 or 39A) that penetrates, preferably only pathway, into a focus opening (40) extending through the base focusing structure. The focus coating, normally of lower resistivity than the base focusing structure, is typically formed by an angled deposition technique. An access conductor (106 or 106A) is preferably electrically coupled to the lower surface of the focus coating. A potential for controlling the focusing of electrons that travel through the focus opening is provided to the focus coating via the access conductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12; H01J 1/30; H01J 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 3/02 (2006.01); H01J 3/18 (2006.01); H01J 9/14 (2006.01); H01J 29/46 (2006.01); H01J 29/62 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 3/022 (2013.01); H01J 9/148 (2013.01); H01J 29/467 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854745 A1 19981203; EP 0985222 A1 20000315; EP 0985222 A4 20060419; JP 2002501662 A 20020115; JP 4204075 B2 20090107; KR 100421750 B1 20040310; KR 100479352 B1 20050331; KR 20030097599 A 20031231

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAVEN, DUANE, A.

2012-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BARTON, ROGER W.

2012-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SPINDT, CHRISTOPHER, J.

2012-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNALL, N., JOHAN

2012-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBERG, STEPHANIE, J.

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 3/02 20060101AFI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 9/14 20060101ALI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 29/46 20060101ALI20120301BHEP

2012-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTRON-EMITTING DEVICE HAVING SPECIALLY CONFIGURED FOCUS COATING AND FABRICATION OF SUCH A DEVICE

2011-01-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027433

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-04-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060303

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 31/12 20060101AFI19990225BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 1/30 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 19/24 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2006-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01J 9/02 20060101ALI20060227BHEP

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANDESCENT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAVEN, DUANE, A.

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BARTON,ROGER W.

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SPINDT, CHRISTOPHER, J.

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KNALL, N., JOHAN

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBERG, STEPHANIE, J.

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE