Global Patent Index - EP 0985231 A1

EP 0985231 A1 2000-03-15 - MICROELECTRONIC CONTACT STRUCTURES

Title (en)

MICROELECTRONIC CONTACT STRUCTURES

Title (de)

MIKROELEKTRONISCHE KONTAKTSTRUKTUREN

Title (fr)

STRUCTURES DE CONTACT MICRO-ELECTRONIQUES

Publication

EP 0985231 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922344 A

Priority

  • US 9809999 W
  • US 9708634 W
  • US 7367998 P
  • US 3247398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852224A1] Microelectronic contact structures (260, 360, 460) are lithographically defined and fabricated by applying a masking layer (220, 320, 420) on a surface of a substrate (202, 302, 402) such as an electronic component, creating an opening (222, 322, 422) in the masking layer, depositing a conductive trace of a seed layer (250, 350, 450) onto the masking layer and into the openings, and building up a mass of conductive material on the conductive trace. The sidewalls of the opening can be sloped (tapered). The conductive trace can be patterned by depositing material through a stencil or shadow mask (240, 340, 440). A protruding feature (230, 430) may be disposed on the masking layer so that a tip end (264, 364, 464) of the contact structure acquires a topography. All of these elements can be constructed as a group to form a plurality of precisely positioned resilient contact structures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/48; H01L 21/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/12 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/3205 (2006.01); H01L 21/48 (2006.01); H01L 21/60 (2006.01); H01L 23/48 (2006.01); H01L 23/498 (2006.01); H01L 23/52 (2006.01); H01L 23/522 (2006.01); H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 12/16 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H05K 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/4853 (2013.01); H01L 23/49811 (2013.01); H01L 23/522 (2013.01); H01L 24/02 (2013.01); H01L 24/11 (2013.01); H01L 24/13 (2013.01); H01L 24/14 (2013.01); H01L 24/16 (2013.01); H01L 24/72 (2013.01); H01L 24/03 (2013.01); H01L 24/05 (2013.01); H01L 24/81 (2013.01); H01L 24/94 (2013.01); H01L 2224/02311 (2013.01); H01L 2224/02313 (2013.01); H01L 2224/0239 (2013.01); H01L 2224/036 (2013.01); H01L 2224/03912 (2013.01); H01L 2224/0401 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05166 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05644 (2013.01); H01L 2224/05666 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11003 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11005 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11334 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11426 (2013.01); H01L 2224/1143 (2013.01); H01L 2224/1145 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11452 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11462 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11464 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11472 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11474 (2013.01); H01L 2224/11823 (2013.01); H01L 2224/119 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13012 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13015 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13016 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13017 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13018 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13019 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13024 (2013.01); H01L 2224/1308 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13082 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13083 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13084 (2013.01); H01L 2224/131 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13109 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13111 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13113 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13116 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13139 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13144 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13147 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13155 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13157 (2013.01); H01L 2224/1316 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13163 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13164 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13166 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13169 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13173 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13176 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13178 (2013.01); H01L 2224/1318 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13184 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13562 (2013.01); H01L 2224/13644 (2013.01); H01L 2224/145 (2013.01); H01L 2224/16145 (2013.01); H01L 2224/16227 (2013.01); H01L 2224/81801 (2013.01); H01L 2224/94 (2013.01); H05K 3/4092 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/13016 + H01L 2924/00012
  2. H01L 2224/94 + H01L 2224/11
  3. H01L 2224/131 + H01L 2924/014
  4. H01L 2224/13018 + H01L 2924/00012
  5. H01L 2224/11464 + H01L 2924/00014
  6. H01L 2224/1145 + H01L 2924/00014
  7. H01L 2224/11452 + H01L 2924/00014
  8. H01L 2224/13166 + H01L 2924/01074
  9. H01L 2224/13155 + H01L 2924/00014
  10. H01L 2224/11462 + H01L 2924/00012
  11. H01L 2224/05166 + H01L 2924/01074
  12. H01L 2224/05644 + H01L 2924/00014
  13. H01L 2224/05666 + H01L 2924/01074
  14. H01L 2224/13012 + H01L 2924/00012
  15. H01L 2224/13147 + H01L 2924/00014
  16. H01L 2224/13157 + H01L 2924/00014
  17. H01L 2224/1316 + H01L 2924/00014
  18. H01L 2224/13144 + H01L 2924/01027
  19. H01L 2224/13144 + H01L 2924/01028
  20. H01L 2224/13144 + H01L 2924/01028 + H01L 2924/01027
  21. H01L 2224/13139 + H01L 2924/00014
  22. H01L 2224/13176 + H01L 2924/00014
  23. H01L 2224/13164 + H01L 2924/00014
  24. H01L 2224/13173 + H01L 2924/00014
  25. H01L 2224/13163 + H01L 2924/01082
  26. H01L 2224/13178 + H01L 2924/00014
  27. H01L 2224/13169 + H01L 2924/00014
  28. H01L 2224/13184 + H01L 2924/00014
  29. H01L 2224/1318 + H01L 2924/00014
  30. H01L 2224/131 + H01L 2924/01108
  31. H01L 2224/131 + H01L 2924/01104
  32. H01L 2224/13111 + H01L 2924/00014
  33. H01L 2224/13116 + H01L 2924/00014
  34. H01L 2224/13113 + H01L 2924/00014
  35. H01L 2224/13109 + H01L 2924/00014
  36. H01L 2224/11426 + H01L 2924/00014
  37. H01L 2224/1143 + H01L 2924/00014
  38. H01L 2224/0239 + H01L 2924/01022 + H01L 2924/01074
  39. H01L 2224/0239 + H01L 2924/01079 + H01L 2924/00014
  40. H01L 2224/119 + H01L 2224/034 + H01L 2224/1147 + H01L 2224/1145 + H01L 2224/11462 + H01L 2224/036
  41. H01L 2224/036 + H01L 2924/00014
  42. H01L 2224/145 + H01L 2924/00012
  43. H01L 2224/11823 + H01L 2924/00014
  44. H01L 2224/13644 + H01L 2924/00014
  45. H01L 2224/94 + H01L 2224/0231
  46. H01L 2224/119 + H01L 2224/0231 + H01L 2224/1147 + H01L 2224/1145 + H01L 2224/114
  47. H01L 2224/81801 + H01L 2924/00014

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852224 A1 19981119; AU 7491598 A 19981208; EP 0985231 A1 20000315; JP 2000512437 A 20000919; JP 2002231718 A 20020816; JP 2003031289 A 20030131; JP 3378259 B2 20030217; KR 100577131 B1 20060510; KR 20040034685 A 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-11-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MICROELECTRONIC CONTACT STRUCTURES

2005-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORMFACTOR, INC.

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORMFACTOR, INC.

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT