Global Patent Index - EP 0985248 A1

EP 0985248 A1 2000-03-15 - ANTENNA FOR HIGH FREQUENCY RADIO SIGNAL TRANSMISSION

Title (en)

ANTENNA FOR HIGH FREQUENCY RADIO SIGNAL TRANSMISSION

Title (de)

ANTENNE ZUM ABSTRAHLEN VON HOCHFREQUENTEN FUNKSIGNALEN

Title (fr)

ANTENNE D'EMISSION DE SIGNAUX RADIOELECTRIQUES DE HAUTE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 0985248 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916829 A

Priority

  • DE 9800615 W
  • DE 19722547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722547A1] The invention relates to an antenna (6) for transmission of high frequency signals in a confined space (3, 4), the emission cone (5) being determined by a dielectric lens (12) around the primary transmitter (13), which dielectric lens (13) is comprised of an internal shell (9) adjusted to said space and an external hemispherical shell (10). Preferably, the antenna (6) is used in the base station (1) of a telecommunication system, whereby said base station (1) and several mobile stations (2) communicate with each other by means of radio signals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 19/06; H01Q 15/02; H01Q 15/08; H01Q 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/00 (2006.01); H01Q 1/42 (2006.01); H01Q 15/08 (2006.01); H01Q 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 19/062 (2013.01); H01Q 1/007 (2013.01); H01Q 1/42 (2013.01); H01Q 15/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854788A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722547 A1 19981203; EP 0985248 A1 20000315; EP 0985248 B1 20011024; ES 2166599 T3 20020416; JP 2002500835 A 20020108; TW 413965 B 20001201; US 6310587 B1 20011030; WO 9854788 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166599 T3

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801877 20011129

2001-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE