Global Patent Index - EP 0985250 A1

EP 0985250 A1 2000-03-15 - CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR A HIGH-FREQUENCY CABLE

Title (en)

CONNECTION ELEMENT FOR A HIGH-FREQUENCY CABLE

Title (de)

ANSCHLUSSELEMENT FÜR HF-KABEL

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE CONNEXION POUR CABLE A HAUTE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 0985250 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919024 A

Priority

  • CH 9800209 W
  • CH 124597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854791A1] The invention relates to a connection element (10) for the isolated single-conductors (20) of a high-frequency cable (12), which are twisted in pairs. Said element has an even number of contact grooves (18) with a cutting or holing device fitted through the insulation (22) of the inserted single-conductor (20), so as to face the end of the conductor. The contact grooves (18) of the connection element (10) have a catch (30) in a first section (D) of the groove length (L) for the associated unseparated conductor pairs (26). This first section is the conductor pair zone (24). A second section (E) of the groove length (L), the single-conductor zone, has catch elements (32, 24) for the single-conductors (20). After uncovering the twisted conductor pairs (26) and the terminal single-conductors (20), the unseparated conductor pairs (26) are locked in the conductor pair zone (24), and the single-conductors (20) are locked in a contact groove (18). In this way, all locked single-conductors (20) and conductor pairs (26) can be pushed into their contact groove (18) or conductor pair zone (24) with the aid of a sealing cap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 9/05; H01R 13/658

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/035 (2013.01); H01R 4/2433 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01); H01R 13/6592 (2013.01); H01R 13/6463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854791A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854791 A1 19981203; AT 224106 T 20020915; AU 7203398 A 19981230; CH 692435 A5 20020614; DE 59805520 D1 20021017; EP 0985250 A1 20000315; EP 0985250 B1 20020911; TW 410492 B 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRECH, FRIDOLIN ALOIS

- Free text: FRECH, FRIDOLIN ALOIS#IM RAIN 5#CH-8488 TURBENTHAL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FRECH, FRIDOLIN ALOIS#IM RAIN 5#CH-8488 TURBENTHAL (CH)

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050520

2005-05-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050520

2004-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040512

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021123

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805520 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224106 T 20020915

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991123

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL SE