Global Patent Index - EP 0985280 A1

EP 0985280 A1 2000-03-15 - TIME-WEIGHTED TRANSMISSION CHANNEL ESTIMATION

Title (en)

TIME-WEIGHTED TRANSMISSION CHANNEL ESTIMATION

Title (de)

ZEITGEWICHTIGTE ÜBERTRAGUNGSKANALSCHÄTZUNG

Title (fr)

SONDAGE A PONDERATION TEMPORELLE D'UN CANAL DE TRANSMISSION

Publication

EP 0985280 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98920611 A

Priority

  • FR 9800734 W
  • FR 9704933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762164A1] The invention concerns a method for estimating a transmission channel from a signal (S) received by said channel. The received signal corresponds to an emitted training sequence, and the method comprises the following steps: acquiring a statistic of the transmission channel; establishing an estimation (Xp) of the channel impulse response function weighted by the channel statistic using the received signal (S).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/005; H04B 1/76; H04L 25/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/76 (2006.01); H04L 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 25/0242 (2013.01); H04B 1/76 (2013.01); H04L 25/0224 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847239A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762164 A1 19981016; FR 2762164 B1 19990924; BR 9808543 A 20010619; CA 2286556 A1 19981022; CN 1256814 A 20000614; EP 0985280 A1 20000315; US 6671313 B1 20031230; WO 9847239 A1 19981022

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2004-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS SA

2003-07-30 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2003-07-02 [D18Z] REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT (DELETED)

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2001-07-18 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2001-06-20 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE