Global Patent Index - EP 0985312 A2

EP 0985312 A2 2000-03-15 - CALLER ONLY INITIATED TWO-WAY WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH CALLER GENERATED BILLING

Title (en)

CALLER ONLY INITIATED TWO-WAY WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH CALLER GENERATED BILLING

Title (de)

BIDIREKTIONALES DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, NUR VOM ANRUFER EINGELEITET, MIT ANRUFERERZEUGTE VERGEBÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL BIDIRECTIONNEL DECLENCHE PAR L'APPELANT SEULEMENT, AVEC FACTURATION A L'APPELANT

Publication

EP 0985312 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98906313 A

Priority

  • US 9802632 W
  • US 79798297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835508A2] A system and method for a two-way wireless communication is disclosed which can only be initiated by, and billed to, a caller. The system utilizes a subscriber apparatus having pager and radiotelephone functions whereby a caller may call the apparatus and gain direct two-way communication with the subscriber. The caller is billed for the communication and the subscriber is unable to initiate any outgoing calls from the apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 15/00; H04Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01); H04W 4/24 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 4/24 (2013.01); H04M 15/00 (2013.01); H04M 15/47 (2013.01); H04M 2215/0148 (2013.01); H04M 2215/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835508 A2 19980813; WO 9835508 A3 19981217; AR 006881 A1 19990929; AU 6156898 A 19980826; CR 5721 A 19980703; EG 21188 A 20001231; EP 0985312 A2 20000315; EP 0985312 A4 20020130; MX 9701442 A 19980830; PE 72598 A1 19981030

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-01-30 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04Q 7/38 A, 7H 04M 15/00 B

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04Q 7/38 A

2000-03-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT NL