Global Patent Index - EP 0985366 A2

EP 0985366 A2 2000-03-15 - Cantilever table

Title (en)

Cantilever table

Title (de)

Freitragende Tischplatte

Title (fr)

Tablette en porte-à-faux

Publication

EP 0985366 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116808 A

Priority

IT TV980121 A

Abstract (en)

A cantilever table comprising a worktop (2) which is perimetrically provided with an arc-like recess (4) to allow arrangement for example adjacent to the trunk of a tree. Fastening elements (5a,5b) for adapting and fastening the worktop (2) to the tree trunk are provided at the arc-like recess (4). A supporting rod (15) of adjustable length is furthermore pivoted to the worktop (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 17/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 5/02 (2006.01); A47B 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 5/02 (2013.01); A47B 37/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT TV980121 A 19980909

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985366 A2 20000315; EP 0985366 A3 20010905; IT 1303351 B1 20001106; IT TV980121 A1 20000309; IT TV980121 D0 19980909

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 17/03 A, 7A 47B 5/02 B, 7A 47B 37/04 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI