Global Patent Index - EP 0985370 A1

EP 0985370 A1 2000-03-15 - Jewellery case with slits

Title (en)

Jewellery case with slits

Title (de)

Schmucklade mit Schlitzen

Title (fr)

Casier à bijoux comportant des fentes

Publication

EP 0985370 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112433 A

Priority

DE 19841518 A

Abstract (en)

A jewelry tray comprises a flexible plastic foil (1') with object holding openings (2), each formed by a cross-cut between two adjacent longitudinal cuts. An Independent claim is also included for the plastic foil (1') of the above jewelry tray.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schmucklade mit Kunststofffolie (1,1'), die mindestens eine Aufnahme (2) für einen bügelförmigen Körperteil eines Schmuckstücks, insbesondere für einen Ring, aufweist. Die Kunststofffolie ist flexibel ausgebildet und die Aufnahme in der Kunststofffolie wird durch zwei nebeneinandergeführte Längsschnitte (3,4,3',4') und einen diese Längsschnitte verbindenden Querschnitt (5,5') gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9015558 A1 19901227 - BRAUN REINER [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985370 A1 20000315; DE 19841518 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI