Global Patent Index - EP 0985457 A2

EP 0985457 A2 2000-03-15 - Sorting system for photographic orders

Title (en)

Sorting system for photographic orders

Title (de)

Sortiereinrichtung für fotografische Aufträge

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tri de commandes photographiques

Publication

EP 0985457 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99117954 A

Priority

IT VE980037 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns a system for sorting photo work orders, comprising a plurality of removable containers 8 disposed at different levels and associated each with a conveying channel which essentially extends vertically with the upper opening facing upwards, and a sorting line comprising a continuous conveyor onto which a plurality of cassettes 2 containing the respective packages of individual photo work orders are placed, said cassettes being provided with bottoms openable following a command output by a control unit when the package contained in a cassette reaches the area of the conveying channel relative to the removable container 8 for which said package is destined, wherein according to the invention each conveying channel is provided at the bottom with a slide 14, the lower end of which opens into the removable container 8 which corresponds to that conveying channel, and that said container is mounted on a supporting structure provided with a resilient means 18 to be movable in relation to the weight of the container itself. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/08; B07C 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0985457 A2 20000315; EP 0985457 A3 20040331; EP 0985457 B1 20060215; DE 69929842 D1 20060420; DE 69929842 T2 20060914; IT 1306474 B1 20010611; IT VE980037 A1 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929842 P 20060420

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-12-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI